Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/19/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/19/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/19/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/21/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/21/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/21/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 03/21/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/08/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/08/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/08/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/08/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/08/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/08/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 04/08/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/15/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/15/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/15/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/15/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/15/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/01/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/01/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/01/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/15/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/15/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/15/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/21/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 05/21/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/22/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/22/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/05/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/05/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/05/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 06/11/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/11/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/11/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/26/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/16/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/16/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/30/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/30/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/30/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/31/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/05/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/05/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/11/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/11/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/30/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/07/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/07/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/07/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/07/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/21/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/21/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/21/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/21/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/21/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/06/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 11/06/1997