Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/19/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/19/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14]* 03/19/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/19/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/20/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/08/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/08/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 04/08/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/08/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 04/08/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/08/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/09/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/10/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/15/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/15/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/15/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/17/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/17/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/17/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/17/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/17/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/17/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/17/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/17/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/17/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 04/17/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/17/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/17/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/17/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/17/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/17/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/17/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/17/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/17/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/17/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/17/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/17/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/17/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/17/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/17/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/23/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/23/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/23/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/29/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/29/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/29/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/29/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/06/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/08/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 05/08/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/13/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/29/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/04/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/04/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/23/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/30/1997
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/27/1998
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/27/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/04/1998