Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/16/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/16/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/16/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/16/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/16/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 04/16/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/16/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/16/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/16/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/16/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/16/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/24/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/24/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/24/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/24/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/24/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/24/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/24/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/24/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/24/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/06/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/06/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/06/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/21/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/21/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 01/28/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/14/1998