Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/19/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/19/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20]* 03/19/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/19/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/08/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 04/08/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 04/08/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/08/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/08/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/08/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/08/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/10/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/10/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/16/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/17/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/06/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/06/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/07/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/14/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/14/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/15/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/15/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/22/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/22/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/03/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 06/03/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/03/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/03/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/03/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/03/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 06/03/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/03/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/03/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/10/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/10/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/10/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/10/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/10/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 06/10/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/10/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/10/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 06/10/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/10/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/11/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/18/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/18/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 06/18/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 06/18/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/18/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/18/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/18/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/24/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/24/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/24/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/24/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/24/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/09/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/09/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 07/09/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/09/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/16/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 07/29/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/29/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/03/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/03/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/16/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 10/28/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/12/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/27/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/25/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/10/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/10/1998
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/19/1998
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/27/1998
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/27/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/21/1998
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/20/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/20/1998
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/20/1998
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 06/17/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/22/1998
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/21/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/21/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/28/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/29/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/16/1998
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 09/17/1998