Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/21/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/15/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/01/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/04/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/10/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/12/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/28/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/29/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/29/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 07/30/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/12/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/21/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/12/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/12/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/15/1998