Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/20/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/08/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/08/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/08/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 04/08/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/08/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/08/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/08/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/08/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/08/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/08/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/08/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/08/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/23/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/23/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/23/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/23/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 04/23/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/23/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/23/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/23/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/23/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/23/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/23/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/23/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/06/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/06/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/06/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 05/06/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/06/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/08/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/16/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/16/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 05/16/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/16/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/16/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/16/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/22/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/05/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 06/05/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/05/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/09/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/09/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/09/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/09/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/09/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/09/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/09/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/09/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/09/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 07/11/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 07/11/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/11/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/17/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/17/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/17/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/17/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/24/1997
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/24/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/24/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/24/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/30/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 07/30/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/30/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/30/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/04/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/04/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/04/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/04/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/04/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/04/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/04/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/04/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/05/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/18/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/18/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/25/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/25/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/25/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/02/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/02/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/02/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/08/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/09/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/09/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/09/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/30/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/30/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/09/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 11/09/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/04/1998
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6] 02/24/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/24/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/24/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 02/25/1998
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 02/25/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/25/1998
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 02/25/1998
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/25/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/25/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 02/25/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/25/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/25/1998
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 02/25/1998
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 02/25/1998
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/25/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/25/1998
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 02/25/1998
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/25/1998
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/26/1998
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/26/1998
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/26/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 02/26/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/26/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/26/1998
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/26/1998
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/26/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/03/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/03/1998
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/03/1998
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 03/03/1998
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/03/1998
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/03/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/03/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/05/1998
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/05/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/05/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/05/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/05/1998
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/05/1998
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/05/1998
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 03/05/1998
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/05/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/05/1998
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/10/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 03/10/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/10/1998
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/12/1998
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/12/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 03/19/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/19/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/25/1998
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/25/1998
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 03/25/1998
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/25/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/25/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/25/1998
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/25/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/26/1998
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 03/26/1998
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/26/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/26/1998
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/26/1998
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/26/1998
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/27/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 03/27/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/27/1998
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/30/1998