Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/07/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/07/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/07/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/07/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/07/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/07/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/07/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/07/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/07/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/07/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/07/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/07/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/07/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/07/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 05/07/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/07/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/07/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 06/03/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/03/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 06/03/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/03/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/03/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/03/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/03/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/20/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/20/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/20/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/20/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/08/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/08/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/08/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/05/1998
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 08/05/1998
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 08/05/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 08/05/1998
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 08/05/1998