Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/24/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/24/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/24/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/24/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/24/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/24/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/24/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/24/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/24/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 04/24/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/24/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 04/30/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/30/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 04/30/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/30/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 04/30/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/30/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/30/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/30/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/30/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/30/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/30/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/30/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/30/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/30/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/30/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/30/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/30/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/30/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 04/30/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/30/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/30/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/30/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/30/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/30/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/30/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/30/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 04/30/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/30/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/30/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/30/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/30/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/30/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/30/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 04/30/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/30/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/30/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/30/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/01/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/01/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 05/01/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/01/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/01/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/01/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/01/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/01/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/01/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/01/1997
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 05/01/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/01/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/07/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/07/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/07/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/07/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/07/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/07/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/15/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/15/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/15/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/15/1997