Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/30/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/30/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/30/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/25/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/25/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/25/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 06/25/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 06/25/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/25/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/25/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/25/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/25/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/25/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/25/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/25/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/25/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/25/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/25/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/25/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/25/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/24/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/24/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/24/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 11/12/1997