Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/20/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/10/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/10/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/10/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/24/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/24/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/24/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 05/01/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/01/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/16/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 05/22/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/22/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/19/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/19/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/26/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/26/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/09/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/17/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/17/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/05/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/05/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/05/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/05/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 09/05/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/05/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/05/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/23/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/23/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/23/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 10/07/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/07/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 11/06/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/11/1998
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/11/1998
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/30/1998
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/01/1998
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/01/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/22/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/14/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/14/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/14/1998
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 07/31/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/16/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/16/1998