Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/21/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/21/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/21/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/10/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/10/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/10/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/10/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/10/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/10/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/17/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/30/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/30/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/15/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/15/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/22/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/22/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/22/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/12/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/22/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/22/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/26/1998