Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/20/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/29/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/29/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/29/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/29/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/29/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/29/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/29/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/16/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/16/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/16/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 06/18/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/18/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/18/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/09/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/09/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/09/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 09/16/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/16/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/16/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/16/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/16/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/26/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/08/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/08/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/08/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/08/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/30/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/30/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/30/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/30/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/30/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 10/30/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/30/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/30/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/30/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/30/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/30/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/30/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/30/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 11/12/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 11/12/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/11/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/11/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/11/1998
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/21/1998
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/21/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/21/1998
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/22/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/22/1998
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/22/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/23/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/23/1998
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/28/1998
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/29/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 08/05/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 08/05/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/21/1998
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/21/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew