Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 03/21/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/21/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/21/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/21/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/21/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 03/21/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/21/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/21/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 03/21/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/21/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/21/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/21/1997
Rep. McDade, Joseph M. [R-PA-10] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/21/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/21/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/21/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/21/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/21/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 03/21/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/21/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 03/21/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/21/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/21/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/21/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/21/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/21/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/21/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/21/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/21/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/21/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/21/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/21/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/21/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/21/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/21/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/21/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/21/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/21/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/21/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/21/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/21/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/21/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/21/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 03/21/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/21/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/21/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Schiff, Steven [R-NM-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/21/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 03/21/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/21/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 03/21/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/21/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/21/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/21/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/21/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/21/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/21/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 03/21/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/21/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/09/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/09/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/09/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/09/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 05/07/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/20/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/04/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/10/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/19/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 09/09/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/22/1998