Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/11/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/11/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/17/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/24/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/24/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 04/24/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/24/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/24/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/24/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/29/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/29/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/01/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 05/01/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/01/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 05/08/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/08/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/22/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/22/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 06/04/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/04/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/19/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/19/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 06/20/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/09/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 11/05/1997