Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 01/07/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/07/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 01/20/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 01/20/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 01/20/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 01/20/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 01/20/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 01/20/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 01/21/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 01/21/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 01/21/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 01/21/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/21/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/21/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/04/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/04/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/04/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/04/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 02/04/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 02/04/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/04/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 02/04/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/04/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 02/04/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 02/13/1997
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 02/13/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/13/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 02/26/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/26/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/26/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/26/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/13/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/13/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 03/20/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 04/08/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/08/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/08/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/09/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 04/17/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 05/22/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/05/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/05/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/18/1997
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/18/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/31/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/31/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/08/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/08/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/08/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 10/06/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/06/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 10/06/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 10/06/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 10/06/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 10/06/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 10/06/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 10/06/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/06/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 10/24/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 10/24/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/24/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/24/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/31/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/31/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/31/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 10/31/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/12/1998
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/12/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/01/1998