Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/08/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/16/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/16/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/16/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/16/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/29/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/29/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/29/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/29/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/05/1997
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/05/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/07/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/07/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/07/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/15/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/20/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/20/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/12/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/18/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/18/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/18/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/18/1997
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/15/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/15/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/22/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/22/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/23/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 07/23/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/25/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/29/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/03/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/03/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 09/05/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/09/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/09/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/10/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/17/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/17/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/17/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/17/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/24/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/24/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/26/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/26/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/02/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/02/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 10/02/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/08/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/08/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/22/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/22/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/22/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/22/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/22/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 10/29/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/29/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/29/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/29/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/29/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/04/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/12/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/12/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 04/01/1998
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/01/1998
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/01/1998
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/22/1998
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/25/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/31/1998
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/31/1998
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/15/1998
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/15/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/09/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/09/1998