Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 04/08/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Gingrich, Newt [R-GA-6]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 04/08/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/08/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/15/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/15/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/15/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 04/15/1997
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/16/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 04/16/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/15/1997
Rep. Buyer, Stephen E. [R-IN-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/15/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/21/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/05/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/25/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/25/1997