Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/07/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/04/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/04/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/04/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 02/04/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/04/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 02/04/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 02/04/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/04/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/04/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 02/06/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/06/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/13/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 01/28/1998