Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/15/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/15/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/15/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/15/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/15/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/15/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/15/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/15/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/15/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/15/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/23/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/23/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/23/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 04/23/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/23/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 04/23/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/23/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 04/24/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/24/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/29/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/29/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/29/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/06/1997
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/06/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/06/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/06/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/06/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/06/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/13/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/13/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/13/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/13/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/13/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/13/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/13/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/13/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 05/13/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/13/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/13/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/21/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/21/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/21/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/21/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/21/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/21/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/21/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/21/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/21/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/22/1997
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/04/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/04/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 06/04/1997
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/10/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/10/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/10/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/10/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/10/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/10/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/10/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/10/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/10/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/10/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 06/18/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/18/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 06/18/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 06/18/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/18/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/18/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/18/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/25/1997
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/25/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/25/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/25/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/26/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/11/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/11/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/11/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/11/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/11/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/11/1997
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/11/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/25/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/25/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/29/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/29/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/03/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 09/03/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/16/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/16/1997
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/18/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/24/1997