Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/24/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/24/1997
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/24/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/24/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/24/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/24/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/24/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/24/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/24/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/24/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/24/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/24/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/24/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/24/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 04/24/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 04/24/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/24/1997
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/24/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/24/1997
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/24/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/24/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 04/24/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/24/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/24/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/07/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 05/07/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/07/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/07/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/07/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/07/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/07/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 05/07/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 05/07/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/07/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/07/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/07/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/07/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/07/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/07/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/07/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/07/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/07/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/07/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/07/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/07/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/07/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/07/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 05/07/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/20/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/20/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/20/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/20/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/11/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/11/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/11/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/10/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/28/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/04/1998