Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/10/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 04/10/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/24/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 04/24/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/24/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/24/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 04/24/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/24/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/24/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/24/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 04/29/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/29/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13] 04/29/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/29/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/05/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 05/05/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/05/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 05/05/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/05/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6] 05/05/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/05/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/05/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/15/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 05/15/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/15/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/15/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/21/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/21/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/21/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/21/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/04/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/04/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/04/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/04/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/17/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/17/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 06/17/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/21/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/21/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/21/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 07/08/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/08/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/08/1997
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/16/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 07/16/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/16/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/16/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/16/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/16/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/28/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/01/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 08/01/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/18/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/18/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/26/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 09/26/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/23/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 10/23/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/13/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 03/18/1998
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/18/1998
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/18/1998
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/18/1998
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 03/18/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 03/18/1998
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 03/18/1998
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/18/1998
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/25/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/25/1998
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/25/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/25/1998
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/25/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/25/1998
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/25/1998
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/25/1998
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/25/1998
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/25/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/30/1998
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/30/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/30/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/29/1998
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/29/1998
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/12/1998
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/12/1998
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/12/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/12/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 06/03/1998
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/03/1998
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/03/1998
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/03/1998
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/03/1998
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/16/1998
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/16/1998
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/16/1998
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/24/1998
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 07/30/1998
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/25/1998
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/25/1998