Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/21/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 01/21/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/04/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/06/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/06/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/04/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 01/27/1998
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 01/27/1998
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/04/1998
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 02/25/1998