Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/29/1997
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 04/30/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/01/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/07/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/13/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/20/1998
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/21/1998
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 07/22/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/23/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/29/1998
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/29/1998
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/30/1998