Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/17/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/17/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 04/24/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 04/30/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/19/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/19/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/20/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/20/1997