Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 04/15/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/30/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/30/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/30/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/30/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/30/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 04/30/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/30/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/30/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/30/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/30/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/30/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/30/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/30/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/30/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/30/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/30/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/30/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/30/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/30/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/30/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/07/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/07/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/07/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/07/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/07/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/07/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/07/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/07/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/07/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/07/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/13/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/16/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/16/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/16/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/16/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/16/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/22/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/22/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 05/22/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/22/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/22/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/22/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/22/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/22/1997
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/04/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/04/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/18/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/18/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/19/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/19/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/17/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/25/1998