Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/06/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/06/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/06/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/06/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 05/06/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/06/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 05/06/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/06/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/06/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/07/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 05/07/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/07/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/07/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/07/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/07/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/07/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/07/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/07/1997
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/07/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/07/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/08/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/08/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/08/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/08/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/08/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 05/08/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/08/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/08/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/08/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/16/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/16/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/16/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/16/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/16/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/16/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/16/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/16/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/16/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 05/16/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/22/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/22/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/04/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/04/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/04/1997
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/04/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/24/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/09/1997