Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/24/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/24/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/29/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/01/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/01/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/14/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/1997