There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to permit beneficiaries of the military health care system to enroll in Federal employees health benefits plans; to improve health care benefits under the CHAMPUS and TRICARE Standard, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/16/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
11/10/1997Unfavorable Executive Comment Received from DOD.
04/22/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Civil Service.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform and Oversight
04/16/1997Referred to Subcommittee on Military Personnel Prior to Introduction (Apr 4, 97).
04/16/1997Referred to House Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
04/16/1997Referred to House National Security
Action By: House of Representatives
04/16/1997Referred to the Committee on National Security, and in addition to the Committee on Government Reform and Oversight, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/16/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (90)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/06/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/06/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/06/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/06/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/21/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/21/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/04/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/04/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/04/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/20/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/20/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/20/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/20/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/20/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/20/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/09/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/16/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/16/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/28/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/28/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/04/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/04/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/04/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/04/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/30/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/22/1997
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/30/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/30/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/04/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/03/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/03/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/03/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/03/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/04/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/04/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/11/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/11/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/11/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/24/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/24/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/24/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/24/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 03/04/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/04/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/04/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/19/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/19/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/19/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 03/19/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/19/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/19/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/19/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/26/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/23/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/23/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/30/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/30/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/14/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/29/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/09/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/09/1998

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House National Security04/16/1997 Referred to
House Government Reform and Oversight04/16/1997 Referred to
House Government Reform Subcommittee on Civil Service04/22/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1356.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1356. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/16/1997)

Amends the Civilian Health and Medical Program of the Uniformed Services (CHAMPUS) to allow certain eligible covered beneficiaries to enroll in any health benefits plan under the Federal Employee Health Benefits Program (FEHB) offering medical and dental care comparable to that offered under CHAMPUS. Includes as an eligible covered beneficiary any member or former member of the armed forces, and any dependent of such member, who: (1) is not guaranteed access under CHAMPUS or TRICARE Standard (a Department of Defense managed care program) to health and dental care comparable to the highest level provided under the FEHB; (2) is eligible to enroll in the TRICARE Program but is not so enrolled because of geographical inaccessibility, enrollment limitations, or any other reason; or (3) is entitled to hospital insurance benefits under Part A of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act. States that any such beneficiary shall not be required to satisfy any FEHB eligibility criteria as a condition for enrollment. Provides for: (1) enrollment contributions; (2) participation management by the Director of the Office of Personnel Management (OPM); and (3) annual reports from the Secretary of Defense and the OPM Director concerning the provision of such care.

Requires the health and dental care benefits provided under CHAMPUS and TRICARE Standard, as well as the rates prescribed for the reimbursement of providers under such programs, to be comparable to the highest level of benefits provided under the FEHB.

Requires the Secretary to begin offering the health benefits option of this Act no later than November 1, 1997.