Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/16/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/06/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/06/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/06/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/06/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/06/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/21/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/21/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/21/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/04/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/04/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/04/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/20/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/20/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/20/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/20/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/20/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/20/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/09/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/16/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/16/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/28/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 07/28/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 09/04/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/04/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/04/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/04/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/30/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/22/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/30/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/30/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/04/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/13/1997
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/03/1998
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 02/03/1998
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/03/1998
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/03/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/03/1998
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/03/1998
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 02/04/1998
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/04/1998
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/04/1998
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/04/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/11/1998
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/11/1998
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/11/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/11/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/24/1998
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/24/1998
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/24/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/24/1998
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/24/1998
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/24/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/24/1998
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/24/1998
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 03/04/1998
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/04/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/04/1998
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/04/1998
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/19/1998
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/19/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/19/1998
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 03/19/1998
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/19/1998
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/19/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/19/1998
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/26/1998
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/26/1998
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/23/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/23/1998
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/23/1998
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/30/1998
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/30/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/14/1998
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 07/29/1998
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/09/1998
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/09/1998