Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Schaefer, Dan [R-CO-6]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/17/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/24/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 04/24/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/24/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/24/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/24/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/24/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/24/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/24/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/24/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 04/24/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 05/01/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/01/1997
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/01/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/01/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/01/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/01/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/01/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 05/08/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/08/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/08/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/08/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/08/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/08/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/08/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 05/20/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/20/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/20/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/20/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/20/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 05/20/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/20/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 05/20/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/20/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/20/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/20/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/22/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/22/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/12/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/12/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 06/12/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/12/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/12/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/12/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/12/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/12/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/12/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/20/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/20/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/20/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/20/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/20/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/20/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/20/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/20/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/20/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 06/20/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/20/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/20/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/09/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 07/09/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 07/09/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/09/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/09/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/09/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 07/09/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 07/09/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/15/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/1997
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/15/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/15/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/15/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/15/1997
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/24/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 07/24/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/30/1997
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/30/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/09/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/09/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/11/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 10/08/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/08/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 01/28/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/28/1998
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 01/28/1998
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/05/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/12/1998
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/26/1998
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/05/1998
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/05/1998
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/18/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/18/1998
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/18/1998
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/01/1998
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/21/1998
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/21/1998
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/21/1998
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/29/1998
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/05/1998
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/05/1998
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/22/1998
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/03/1998
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/28/1998