Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/29/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/29/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/14/1997
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/18/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 09/04/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/17/1998