Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/23/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/01/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/03/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/23/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/26/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/26/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 06/26/1997
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/26/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/10/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 07/10/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/10/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 07/22/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/22/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/31/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/08/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/08/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/08/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/08/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/11/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/11/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/18/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 09/23/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/29/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 10/01/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/01/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 10/01/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/02/1997
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 10/09/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/22/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 11/05/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/12/1998
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/24/1998
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 02/24/1998
Rep. Thune, John R. [R-SD-At Large] 03/25/1998
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/31/1998
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/09/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 10/07/1998