Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 04/23/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/04/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/04/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/04/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/04/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/04/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/04/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/04/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/05/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/10/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/10/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/19/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/19/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/19/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/19/1997
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/19/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/25/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/25/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/08/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/08/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/11/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/31/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/31/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/04/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/04/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/04/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/04/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/04/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/04/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/23/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/23/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/26/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/30/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/08/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/28/1997