There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Open Competition and Fairness Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To prohibit discrimination in contracting on federally funded projects on the basis of certain labor policies of potential contractors.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/17/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
05/02/1997Referred to the Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/17/1997Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/17/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (125)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 04/17/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/29/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/29/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 04/29/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/29/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/29/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/29/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/29/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/29/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/29/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/29/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/29/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/29/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/29/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/29/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/06/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/06/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/06/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/06/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/06/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/06/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/22/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/22/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/22/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/26/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/26/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/15/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/15/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 07/15/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/15/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/15/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/30/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/08/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/17/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/17/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/17/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/17/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 10/07/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/09/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 11/06/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/06/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/13/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/03/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/03/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/24/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/12/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/14/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/22/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/09/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/23/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/21/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/20/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce04/17/1997 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Employer-Employee Relations05/02/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1378.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1378. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/17/1997)

Open Competition and Fairness Act of 1997 - Amends the National Labor Relations Act to prohibit discrimination against any bidder on a prime contract for a federally funded project on the basis of a requirement that such person enter into or adhere to a collective bargaining agreement or any similar agreement as a condition of performing work on such contract.