Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 04/17/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Chenoweth, Helen [R-ID-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/29/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/29/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 04/29/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/29/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/29/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/29/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/29/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 04/29/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/29/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 04/29/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/29/1997
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/29/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 04/29/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/29/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/29/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/29/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/29/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/06/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/06/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/06/1997
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/06/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/06/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/06/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/06/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/06/1997
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/22/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 05/22/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/22/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/22/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/22/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/26/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 06/26/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/15/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/15/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 07/15/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/15/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/15/1997
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/15/1997
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/30/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/08/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/17/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/17/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/17/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/17/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Redmond, Bill [R-NM-3] 10/07/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/07/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/09/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/09/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 11/06/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/06/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/06/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/13/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/03/1998
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/03/1998
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/03/1998
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/24/1998
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/12/1998
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/14/1998
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 05/22/1998
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/09/1998
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 06/09/1998
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/23/1998
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/21/1998
Rep. Livingston, Bob [R-LA-1] 10/20/1998