Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Neumann, Mark W. [R-WI-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Fawell, Harris W. [R-IL-13]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/17/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/17/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 06/17/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 06/17/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/17/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/17/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/17/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/17/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/17/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/17/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/17/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 10/06/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 10/22/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 02/24/1998
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 03/10/1998