There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Capital Gains Tax Reduction Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to provide maximum rates of tax on capital gains of 14 percent for individuals and 28 percent for corporations and to index the basis of assets of individuals for purposes of determining gains and losses.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/07/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
07/22/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H5494-5495)
Action By: House of Representatives
05/05/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2164-2166)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/30/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2012)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/24/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1801)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/09/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1347)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H37)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/07/1997Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (159)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 01/09/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 01/09/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 01/09/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/09/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/09/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 01/09/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/09/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/09/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 01/09/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/09/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 01/09/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/09/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 01/09/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/09/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/09/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 01/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/09/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/09/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 01/09/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/09/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/20/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/20/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/20/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/20/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/20/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 01/20/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 01/20/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/05/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/05/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/05/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/05/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/05/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/05/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/05/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/05/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/05/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/05/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/05/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/05/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/05/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/05/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/05/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/05/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/05/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/05/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 02/05/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/05/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/05/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/05/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/05/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/05/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/05/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/05/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/05/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 02/11/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/11/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/11/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/11/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/11/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/11/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/11/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/11/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/11/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/25/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/25/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/11/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/11/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/11/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/11/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/11/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/11/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/11/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/11/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/18/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/18/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/18/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/18/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/18/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/18/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/18/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/18/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/18/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/18/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/20/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/20/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/20/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/20/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/20/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 03/20/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/09/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 04/09/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/09/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/09/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/09/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/09/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/09/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/09/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/09/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/09/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/09/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/09/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/09/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/09/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/15/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/15/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/15/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/15/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/17/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/17/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/17/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 04/17/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/29/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 05/01/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/01/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/15/1997
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/15/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/15/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/15/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/15/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/15/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/15/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/15/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/15/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/11/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/11/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/11/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/11/1997

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/07/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.14.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.14. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/07/1997)

Capital Gains Tax Reduction Act of 1997 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to reduce the maximum capital gains tax rates for both individuals and corporations.

Provides for the indexing of assets for determining gain or loss.