Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 01/09/1997
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 01/09/1997
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 01/09/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 01/09/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 01/09/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 01/09/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 01/09/1997
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/09/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 01/09/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/09/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 01/09/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 01/09/1997
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 01/09/1997
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 01/09/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 01/09/1997
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 01/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 01/09/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 01/09/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41] 01/09/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22] 01/09/1997
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/20/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 01/20/1997
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/20/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 01/20/1997
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/20/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 01/20/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 01/20/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/05/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/05/1997
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/05/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/05/1997
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 02/05/1997
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/05/1997
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/05/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/05/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/05/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/05/1997
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/05/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/05/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/05/1997
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/05/1997
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/05/1997
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/05/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 02/05/1997
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 02/05/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 02/05/1997
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/05/1997
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/05/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 02/05/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/05/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 02/05/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/05/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 02/05/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/05/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3] 02/11/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/11/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 02/11/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/11/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/11/1997
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 02/11/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/11/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 02/11/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/11/1997
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/25/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/25/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/25/1997
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 02/25/1997
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/11/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/11/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/11/1997
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/11/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/11/1997
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/11/1997
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/11/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/11/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/11/1997
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/18/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/18/1997
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/18/1997
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/18/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/18/1997
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/18/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/18/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/18/1997
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/18/1997
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/18/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/20/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/20/1997
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/20/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/20/1997
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/20/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 03/20/1997
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 03/20/1997
Rep. Parker, Mike [R-MS-4] 03/20/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 03/20/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/09/1997
Rep. Pappas, Michael [R-NJ-12] 04/09/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/09/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/09/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/09/1997
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/09/1997
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/09/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/09/1997
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/09/1997
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/09/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/09/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/09/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/09/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/09/1997
Rep. Paxon, Bill [R-NY-27] 04/09/1997
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 04/15/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/15/1997
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/15/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 04/15/1997
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/15/1997
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/17/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/17/1997
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/17/1997
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/17/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 04/17/1997
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/17/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/17/1997
Rep. Crapo, Mike [R-ID-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/29/1997
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/29/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 05/01/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/01/1997
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 05/15/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 05/15/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/15/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/15/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/15/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/15/1997
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/15/1997
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/15/1997
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 05/15/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/15/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 06/11/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/11/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/11/1997
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/11/1997