Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/17/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/17/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/05/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/05/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 06/05/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/05/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 06/05/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/05/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/05/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/05/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/05/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/05/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/05/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/05/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/05/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 06/05/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/05/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/05/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/05/1997
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/05/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/05/1997
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/05/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/05/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/05/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/05/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 06/05/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/26/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/26/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/26/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 06/26/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/26/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/26/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/26/1997
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 06/26/1997
Rep. Sawyer, Thomas C. [D-OH-14] 06/26/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/26/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/26/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/26/1997
Rep. Gonzalez, Henry B. [D-TX-20] 06/26/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/26/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/26/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/26/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/26/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/26/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/26/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/26/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/26/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 06/26/1997
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/26/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/31/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/31/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/31/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/31/1997
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/31/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/31/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 07/31/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/29/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/29/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/29/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/29/1997
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/07/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/01/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/01/1998
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/01/1998
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/01/1998
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 04/01/1998
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/11/1998
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/11/1998
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/11/1998
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/11/1998
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/11/1998
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 06/11/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/20/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/20/1998
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/16/1998