Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 07/15/1998