There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Wildlife Refuge System Improvement Act of 1997

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Wildlife Refuge System Improvement Act of 1997

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Wildlife Refuge System Improvement Act of 1997

Short Titles as Introduced

National Wildlife Refuge System Improvement Act of 1997

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Wildlife Refuge System Improvement Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Wildlife Refuge System Administration Act of 1966 to improve the management of the National Wildlife Refuge System, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
10/09/1997Became Public Law No: 105-57. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/1997Signed by President.
09/30/1997Presented to President.
09/23/1997Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 419 - 1 (Roll no. 424).(consideration: CR H7714)
09/10/1997Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/03/1997Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 1 (Roll no. 156).
05/21/1997Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-106.
04/23/1997Introduced in House

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/09/1997Became Public Law No: 105-57. (TXT | PDF)
10/09/1997Signed by President.
09/30/1997HousePresented to President.
09/23/1997-10:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/23/1997-10:09pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 419 - 1 (Roll no. 424). (consideration: CR H7714)
09/23/1997-5:35pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Speaker put the question on the motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill and announced that, by voice vote, the Motion was agreed to. Mr. Condit objected to the vote on grounds that a quorum was not present and made a point of order that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings were postponed and the point of no quourum was withdrawn.
09/23/1997-5:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/23/1997-5:31pmHouseMr. Young (AK) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments.
09/11/1997SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/10/1997SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/10/1997SenateAmendment SP 1129 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/10/1997SenateS.Amdt.1129 Amendment SP 1129 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/10/1997SenateS.Amdt.1129 Proposed by Senator Gorton for Senator Chafee. To improve the bill.
09/10/1997SenateAmendment SP 1129 proposed by Senator Gorton for Senator Chafee.
09/10/1997SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9092-9096)
06/04/1997SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
06/03/1997-5:34pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/03/1997-5:34pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 1 (Roll no. 156).
06/03/1997-5:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business.
06/03/1997-3:08pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 5, rule I, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
06/03/1997-2:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
06/03/1997-2:41pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3225-3232, H3238-3239)
06/03/1997-2:41pmHouseMr. Young (AK) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/21/1997HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 64.
05/21/1997HouseReported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-106.
04/30/1997HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Resources
04/30/1997HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Resources
04/29/1997HouseFavorable Executive Comment Received from Interior.
04/23/1997HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
04/23/1997HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Resources04/23/1997 Referred to
04/30/1997 Markup by
05/21/1997 Reported by H. Rept. 105-106

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1420. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (09/10/1997)

National Wildlife Refuge System Improvement Act of 1997 - Amends the National Wildlife Refuge System Administration Act of 1966 (the Act) to state as the mission of the National Wildlife Refuge System to administer a national network of lands and waters for the conservation, management, and restoration of fish, wildlife and plant resources and their habitats.

Adds requirements that, in administering the System, the Secretary of the Interior shall: (1) ensure that the System's mission and policies are carried out, except that if a conflict exists between the purposes of a refuge and the System mission, it shall be resolved in a manner that first protects the purposes of the refuge; and (2) monitor the status and trends of fish, wildlife, and plants in each refuge.

Recognizes and supports wildlife-dependent recreation (recreation which involves hunting, fishing, wildlife observation and photography, or environmental education and interpretation) within the System.

Authorizes the Secretary to enter into cooperative arrangements with State fish and wildlife agencies for the management of programs on a refuge.

Prohibits the Secretary from initiating or permitting a new refuge use or expanding, renewing, or extending an existing use, unless the Secretary determines that such use is a compatible use which is not inconsistent with public safety.

Establishes compatibility standards and procedures, including those for wildlife-dependent recreational uses. Requires the Secretary to issue final regulations establishing the process for determining a compatible use. States that the compatibility determination provisions of the Act shall not apply to overflights above a refuge or to activities authorized, funded, or conducted by a Federal agency having primary jurisdiction over a refuge.

Directs the Secretary to propose comprehensive conservation plans for each refuge in the System except for lands in Alaska (which are governed by the Alaska National Interest Lands Conservation Act). Requires maximum 15-year cycles of plan revision. Sets forth matters to be considered in plan development, including fish and wildlife distribution and migration patterns, plant populations, archaeological and cultural values, habitat problems, and opportunities for compatible wildlife-dependent recreation.

Authorizes the Secretary to temporarily suspend any refuge activity when necessary to protect the health and safety of the public or any fish or wildlife population.