Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/23/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 05/13/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/13/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/13/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/13/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/30/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/30/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/03/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/03/1997
Rep. Yates, Sidney R. [D-IL-9] 06/04/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/11/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/17/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/28/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/03/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/08/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/06/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/06/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/08/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/08/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/08/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/08/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/21/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/21/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/22/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/30/1997
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/31/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/31/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 11/05/1997
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/06/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/12/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/12/1997
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 11/13/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/27/1998
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 01/27/1998
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/28/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/03/1998
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/03/1998
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/03/1998
Rep. Stokes, Louis [D-OH-11] 02/04/1998
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 02/04/1998
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/12/1998
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/12/1998
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 03/12/1998
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/12/1998
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/23/1998
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/23/1998
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 04/22/1998
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/19/1998
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/14/1998