Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/07/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/07/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 02/13/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/13/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 02/13/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/13/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 02/13/1997
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 02/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/13/1997
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/13/1997
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 02/13/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/13/1997
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1] 02/13/1997
Rep. Smith, Robert [R-OR-2] 02/13/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/13/1997
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/13/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., II [D-MA-8] 02/13/1997
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/13/1997
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 02/13/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/27/1997
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/27/1997
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/27/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 02/27/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/27/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/27/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/04/1997
Rep. Ensign, John [R-NV-1] 03/04/1997
Rep. Christensen, Jon [R-NE-2] 03/04/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/13/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/13/1997
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/13/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/13/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 03/13/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/13/1997
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 03/13/1997
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/13/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 03/13/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 03/19/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/19/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11] 03/19/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/20/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 03/20/1997
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/16/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/16/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/16/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/16/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/16/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 04/16/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/16/1997
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/16/1997
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 04/16/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 04/16/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/16/1997
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/16/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1] 04/30/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 04/30/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/14/1997
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/14/1997
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/14/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/14/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/14/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/14/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 05/14/1997
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/14/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/14/1997
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/14/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/14/1997
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/19/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/19/1997
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/19/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/19/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/19/1997
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/24/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/24/1997
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/24/1997