Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/24/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/24/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 04/24/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/28/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/28/1997
Rep. Klug, Scott L. [R-WI-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/08/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/08/1997
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/08/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 05/08/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/08/1997
Rep. Flake, Floyd H. [D-NY-6] 05/19/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/19/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/12/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/12/1997
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/19/1997
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/01/1997
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/21/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 11/04/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/06/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/03/1998
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/24/1998