Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 04/24/1997
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/24/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/24/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Smith, Linda [R-WA-3]* 04/24/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 04/29/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/29/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/29/1997
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/29/1997
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/29/1997
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/30/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 04/30/1997
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 05/01/1997
Rep. Capps, Walter [D-CA-22] 05/01/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/01/1997
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/07/1997
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/07/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/07/1997
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/07/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 05/08/1997
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 05/21/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/18/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/18/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/18/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/18/1997
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/18/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/11/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/15/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/23/1997
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/23/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/21/1997
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 11/07/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/25/1998
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/14/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew