Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/07/1997
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/07/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/04/1997
Rep. Skaggs, David E. [D-CO-2] 02/04/1997
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/05/1997
Rep. Poshard, Glenn [D-IL-19] 02/05/1997
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/12/1997
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/12/1997
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/27/1997
Rep. Dellums, Ronald V. [D-CA-9] 02/27/1997
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/27/1997
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/06/1997
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/06/1997
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/06/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/06/1997
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/06/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/19/1997
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/19/1997
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/20/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/09/1997
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/09/1997
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/09/1997
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/09/1997
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/09/1997
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/09/1997
Rep. Foglietta, Thomas M. [D-PA-1] 04/09/1997
Rep. Hefner, W. G. (Bill) [D-NC-8] 04/09/1997
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/09/1997
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/09/1997
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/09/1997
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/09/1997
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/09/1997
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/15/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 04/15/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/15/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/15/1997
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 04/15/1997
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/24/1997
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 04/24/1997
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/24/1997
Rep. Johnson, Jay W. [D-WI-8] 04/24/1997
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/24/1997
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/24/1997
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/30/1997
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/30/1997
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/30/1997
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/30/1997
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/30/1997
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 04/30/1997
Rep. McHale, Paul [D-PA-15] 04/30/1997
Rep. Torres, Estaban Edward [D-CA-34] 04/30/1997
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/01/1997
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/01/1997
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/01/1997
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/01/1997
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/06/1997
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/06/1997
Rep. Hamilton, Lee H. [D-IN-9] 05/06/1997
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/06/1997
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/08/1997
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Fazio, Vic [D-CA-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/08/1997
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 05/08/1997
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/13/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/13/1997
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/13/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/15/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 05/15/1997
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/15/1997
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/20/1997
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/20/1997
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/20/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/30/1997
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/30/1997
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/04/1997
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/04/1997
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/04/1997
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/04/1997
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/04/1997
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/04/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/04/1997
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/04/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/04/1997
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/04/1997
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/10/1997
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/10/1997
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/12/1997
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/12/1997
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/12/1997
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/17/1997
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/17/1997
Rep. Baesler, Scotty [D-KY-6] 06/17/1997
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 06/23/1997
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/23/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/23/1997
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/23/1997
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/26/1997
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/26/1997
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/10/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/10/1997
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/10/1997
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/17/1997
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/17/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/25/1997
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/25/1997
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/03/1997
Rep. Christian-Green, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/03/1997
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/03/1997
Rep. Manton, Thomas J. [D-NY-7] 09/03/1997
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/03/1997
Rep. Coburn, Tom A. [R-OK-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 09/03/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/03/1997
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/03/1997
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/10/1997
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/10/1997
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 09/30/1997
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/30/1997
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/24/1997
Rep. Kennelly, Barbara B. [D-CT-1] 10/24/1997
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/24/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/24/1997
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/30/1997
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/30/1997
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/30/1997
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/30/1997
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 11/07/1997
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 01/28/1998
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/28/1998
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/28/1998
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/11/1998
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/26/1998
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/26/1998
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/23/1998
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/23/1998
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 06/23/1998
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/23/1998
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/25/1998
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/25/1998
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/25/1998
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/25/1998
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/25/1998
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/16/1998
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 07/16/1998
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/10/1998
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/10/1998
Rep. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY-9] 09/23/1998