Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/29/1997
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 05/01/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/01/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/01/1997
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/15/1997
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/05/1997
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/23/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 07/22/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/22/1997
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/22/1997
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/31/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/03/1997
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/08/1997
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/23/1997
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/23/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/31/1997
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/11/1998