Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Bunning, Jim [R-KY-4]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Davis, Thomas M. [R-VA-11]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Solomon, Gerald B. H. [R-NY-22]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/05/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/05/1997
Rep. Sensenbrenner, James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/06/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/07/1997
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/08/1997
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/19/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 05/19/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/22/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/26/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/26/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/08/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/15/1997
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 07/16/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/16/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/22/1997
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/28/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/23/1998
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 05/06/1998