Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Riggs, Frank [R-CA-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Kim, Jay [R-CA-41]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/08/1997
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/16/1997
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/16/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/16/1997
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/16/1997
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/22/1997
Rep. Bono, Sonny [R-CA-44] 05/22/1997
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/22/1997
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 05/22/1997
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/03/1997
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 06/26/1997
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/26/1997
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/26/1997
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/23/1997
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/23/1997
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/25/1997
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/25/1997
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/25/1997
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/31/1997
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/31/1997
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/31/1997
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/05/1997
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/24/1997
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/24/1997