Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Snowbarger, Vince [R-KS-3]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/30/1997
Rep. White, Rick [R-WA-1]* 04/30/1997
Rep. Furse, Elizabeth [D-OR-1] 05/01/1997
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 05/01/1997
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/01/1997
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/01/1997
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/06/1997
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/08/1997
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/13/1997
Rep. Molinari, Susan [R-NY-13] 05/14/1997
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/19/1997
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/19/1997
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/20/1997
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/20/1997
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 05/22/1997
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/03/1997
Rep. Fox, Jon D. [R-PA-13] 06/10/1997
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/10/1997
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/11/1998